Marceaux et al v. Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government et al

Plaintiff: Kane Marceaux, Greg Cormier, Scott Poiencot, Gabriel Thompson, Norbert Myers, Novey Stelly, Uletom P Hewitt, Regina Briscoe and Aleeta M Harding
Defendant: Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, City Police of Lafayette, Lester Joseph Durel, Jr, Dee Edward Stanley, James P Craft and George Jackie Alfred
Case Number: 6:2012cv01532
Filed: June 5, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2014 165 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR JUDGMENT granting 144 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 8/8/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
April 11, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 130 Report and Recommendations, ; DENYING 61 Sealed Motion; adopting Report and Recommendations re 130 Report and Recommendations.; GRANTED AS AMENDED HEREIN 13 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/9/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 30, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 79 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 64 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/23/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 1/31/2013 to correct file date (Dauterive, C).
December 3, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Hold Defendant Lafayette Consolidated Government in Civil Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/3/12. (crt,Kennedy, T)
October 18, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/18/12. (crt,Yocum, M)
September 19, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 18 MOTION for Protective Order filed by George Jackie Alfred, Lester Joseph Durel, Jr, Dee Edward Stanley, City Police of Lafayette, James P Craft, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, 18 MOTION for Sanctions filed by George Jackie Alfred, Lester Joseph Durel, Jr, Dee Edward Stanley, City Police of Lafayette, James P Craft, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government. A separate order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/18/12. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marceaux et al v. Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kane Marceaux
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Cormier
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Poiencot
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Thompson
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbert Myers
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novey Stelly
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uletom P Hewitt
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Briscoe
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleeta M Harding
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Police of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Joseph Durel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Edward Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Jackie Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?