Hefren v. Murphy Exploration & Production Co U S A et al

Plaintiff: James Hefren
Defendant: Murphy Exploration & Production Co-U S A and J Ray McDermott Gulf Gulf Contractors Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv01899
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Mary
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 46:0688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Ruling dated 8/27/2015, IT IS ORDERED the Objections file by Murphy Exploration & Production Co U S A to the 104 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge are hereby OVERRULED and McDermott Inc is awarded attorney fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/27/2015. (crt,Putch, A)
July 16, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING For the reasons stated herein, IT IS ORDERED THAT McDermott's 57 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter of amount of the costs of defense, attorney's fees and expenses incu rred by McDermott in defense of Hefren's claims is hereby REFERRED to the magistrate judge for consideration and recommendation. Pursuant to Rule 54(d)(2)(D), the magistrate judge shall prepare a Report recommending the amount to be awarded to M cDermott, in consideration of the appropriate standards and evidence to be submitted by the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's 59 MOTION for to Certify as Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) is DENIED. It appears this Ruling adjudicat es all remaining claims in this matter. The parties shall confirm via a joint letter to the Court within the next ten (10) days of this Ruling, whether the foregoing is accurate and whether there remain any issues for trial, currently scheduled on September 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/16/14. cc: CMH/mbd(crt,Guidry, C)
April 9, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by McDermott Inc. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 46) filed by defendant McDermott Inc is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claims against McDermott are DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 4/9/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
February 21, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Pending before the Court is the 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Dismiss Contractual Indemnity Claims of McDermott Inc filed by cross-defendant Murphy Exploration & Production Co USA. The motion is opposed by defendant/c ross-claimant McDermott Inc and Murphy has filed an 41 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum, which is herein GRANTED. Considering the foregoing, IT IS ORDERED that the 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Murphy Explora tion and Production Co USA is GRANTED, and McDermott's claim for contractual indemnity from Murphy, to the extent McDermott has requested indemnification from McDermott's own negligence or fault in causing the plaintiff's alleged injuries, is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/20/2014. (crt,Putch, A)
May 2, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Murphy Exploration & Production Co-U S A. Considering the foregoing, the Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 26], appearing to be well-founded in law and fact and being unoppo sed by the plaintiff, is hereby GRANTED. All claims against Murphy Exploration & Production Co., USA in the instant action are DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. As the foregoing ruling appears to dispose of all claims in this matter, the parties shall submit a proposed Final Judgment, approved as to form, within ten (10) days of the date of this Ruling. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/2/13. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hefren v. Murphy Exploration & Production Co U S A et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration & Production Co-U S A
Represented By: Douglas P Matthews
Represented By: Andrew J Quackenbos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ray McDermott Gulf Gulf Contractors Inc
Represented By: Edward Joseph Koehl, Jr
Represented By: William P Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hefren
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Jason Christian MacFetters
Represented By: Timothy J Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?