Kelso et al v. Butler et al

Plaintiff: Malcolm Kelso and A & H Oil Interest L L C
Defendant: Christine A Butler, Christine A Butler P A, Humble Holdings L L C, Margaret Humble Lantz Family L L C and Hebert Family Holdings L L C
Case Number: 6:2012cv02756
Filed: October 24, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2015 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 190 Minutes of Telephone Pretrial Conference. The Clerk is asked to terminate A & H Oil Interest L L C in the record of this matter. A & H Oil Interest L L C terminated. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 1/19/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 29, 2014 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. Based on the court's review of the multiple submissions of the parties, their oral arguments, and the applicable law, the plaintiff's 83 Motion to Compel Discovery and for Contempt is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Because the subject motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, no attorney fees or costs will be awarded. The request to hold the defendant in contempt is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/29/2014. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 14, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RULING denying 57 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/8/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 9, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/8/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 25, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 35 Motion to Compel. Defendants shall have ten (10) days to amend their discovery answers and to make proper responses. The defendants shall be given 10 days to make any objections to the proposed attorney's fee submitted by counsel for the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/25/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelso et al v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Kelso
Represented By: Michael W Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A & H Oil Interest L L C
Represented By: Michael W Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A Butler P A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humble Holdings L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Humble Lantz Family L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hebert Family Holdings L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?