Dugas v. Mercedes-Benz U S A L L C et al

Plaintiff: Marie Dugas and Krystal Dorsey
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz U S A L L C and Moss Motors Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv02885
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Currently pending is the plaintiffs' 132 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. After reviewing the arguments presented, the applicable law, and the supporting documentation, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs' motion for the recovery of attorneys' fees is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not later than 14 days after the date of this ruling, the defendant shall pay to the plaintiffs, through the plaintiffs' counsel, the sum of $2,612.50. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/16/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 2, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 124 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 123 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 2/25/15. (crt,Kennedy, T)
August 5, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTION: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs' first pending 102 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs' second pending 111 Motion to Compel is GRANTED, and MBUSA shall respond to the relevant dis covery requests not later than 14 days after the date of this order; and IT IS ORDERED that MBUSA shall reimburse the plaintiffs for the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred in bringing the motion to compel (Rec. Doc. 111). IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that the defendant's pending 104 Motion to enforce the scheduling order is DENIED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the fact discovery cut-off date set forth in the scheduling order (Rec. Doc. 77) is VACATED, with all other dates and deadlines set forth in the scheduling order remaining the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/5/2014. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 3, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTION granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Compel; denying 58 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED that the pending motion to compel (Rec. Doc. 58) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. More particularly, IT IS ORDER ED that the motion is denied to the extent that MB seeks to require the plaintiffs to respond to discovery propounded by Moss Motors; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is denied with regard to MBsrequest that the plaintiffs provide more complete responses to MBs Interrogatory No. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is denied with regard to MBs request that the plaintiffs provide more complete responses to MBs Interrogatory No. 4 except that the plaintiffs are ordered to supplement their re sponse to Interrogatory No. 4 with regard to their own vehicle and to do so not more than fourteen days after the date of this ruling; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall verify their responses to all of MBs discovery requests that have not yet been verified; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that MBs request for expenses and attorneys fees is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/3/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugas v. Mercedes-Benz U S A L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Dugas
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Represented By: Kevin R Duck
Represented By: John R Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Dorsey
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Represented By: Kevin R Duck
Represented By: John R Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz U S A L L C
Represented By: Janet Daly McGrew
Represented By: Perry R Staub, Jr
Represented By: Mark Edward Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moss Motors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?