Contigouris et al v. Westpac Resources, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Spyridon Contigouris and Stephen Baldwin
Defendant: Westpac Resources L L C, Patrick N Smith, Kevin M Costner and Rabobank N A
Respondent: Michael Moreno
Case Number: 6:2012mc00002
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 7 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: denying without prejudice reserving the movants' right to re-urge the Motion after Judge Feldman has ruled on the pending dispositive motion in the underlying case. 1 Motion to Compel; SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 2/28/2012. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Davenport, M)
February 28, 2012 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1 MOTION to Compel Michael Moreno to Produce Discovery filed by Spyridon Contigouris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1- 2)(crt,Davenport, M)
February 28, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 2/27/2012. (crt,Davenport, M)
February 23, 2012 4 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum with consent sought but not yet obtained by Spyridon Contigouris. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum / Brief, # 2 Text of proposed order, # 3 Proposed pleading, # 4 Proposed exhibit)(aty,Emmett, John)
February 16, 2012 3 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Compel Michael Moreno to Produce Discovery filed by Michael Moreno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B-Order & Reasons, # 3 Exhibit C-Order, # 4 Exhibit D-Scheduling Order)(aty,Russo, Gary)
January 25, 2012 2 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 1 Motion to Compel. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/28/2012 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill.. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 1/25/12. (crt,Lundy, N)
January 20, 2012 CASE Assigned to Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Lundy, N)
January 20, 2012 1 MOTION to Compel Michael Moreno to Produce Discovery by Stephen Baldwin, Spyridon Contigouris. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum / Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of proposed order)(aty,Emmett, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contigouris et al v. Westpac Resources, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spyridon Contigouris
Represented By: Matthew F Popp
Represented By: John F Emmett
Represented By: Randolph J Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Baldwin
Represented By: John F Emmett
Represented By: Matthew F Popp
Represented By: Randolph J Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westpac Resources L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick N Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M Costner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabobank N A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?