Petroleum Helicopters Inc v. Apical Industries Inc et al

Plaintiff: Petroleum Helicopters Inc
Defendant: Apical Industries Inc, Offshore Helicopter Support Services Inc and Rolls Royce Corp
Case Number: 6:2013cv00015
Filed: January 4, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2017 264 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTION. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' 262 Motion for Reconsideration re 256 Ruling on Motion in Limine, when construed as a ruling for relief under Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b), is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/9/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 8, 2017 259 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTION. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' 257 Motion for Reconsideration, when construed as a ruling for relief under Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b), is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/8/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 26, 2017 256 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTIONS. For the reasons herein, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's 229 Trial Brief is considered to be a motion in limine which is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' 224 Motion in Limine regarding co mparative fault and tort-based affirmative defenses is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff's 228 Motion in Limine concerning hammering of the bearing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff's 228 Moti on in Limine concerning the value or repair cost of the engine is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event the defendants are found liable, the defendants are not entitled to a 50% credit for the settlement between PHI and Rolls Royce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/26/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 15, 2017 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 202 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 209 Motion for Leave Requesting Permission to Submit a Confidential Affidavit to the Court for In Camera Review. Considering the evidence, the briefs, the arguments of counsel, an d the applicable law, and for the reasons explained herein, the plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment is denied, and the defendants' motion for in camera review of a confidential affidavit is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/15/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 27, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court SEVERANCE ORDER : It is hereby Ordered that the claims Petroleum Helicopters Inc, asserts against Rolls-Royce Corporation in the above captioned action are hereby severed assigned cause number 6:15cv1767 of this Court and entitled Petroleum Helicopte rs Inc v. Rolls-Royce Corporation. By separate Order, that action will be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division, in accord with the Fifth Circuit's Mandate. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/27/15. (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 7, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING For the foregoing reasons, and for the additional reasons set forth in the well-reasoned and meticulously cited Report and Recommendations 132 , IT IS ORDERED that the "Renewed 106 Motion to Transfer is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/6/14. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 9, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 69 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apical Industries Inc, 58 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apical Industries Inc. Considering the foregoing, the "Motion for P artial Summary Judgment" [Doc. 58] filed by Apical is DENIED AS MOOT, and the "Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment" [Doc. 69] filed by Apical is GRANTED in its entirety, and PHI's claims against Apical under the LPLA are DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/9/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 23, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 18 Motion to Remand. The defendants removed this action from state court, contending that the amount in controversy exceeds the jurisdictional threshold, that the plaintiff is diverse in citizenship from defendants Apical and Rolls Royce, that the plaintiff is not diverse in citizenship from defendant OHS, and that the citizenship of OHS must bedisregarded because OHS was improperly joined as a defendant in the suit. PHIsought to remand the action, arguing that there is a possibility that PHI can recover from OHS with regard to the claim set forth in its amended complaint, and therefore arguing that OHS was not improperly joined. The defendants satisfied their burden of proving that the parties are diverse in ci tizenship and that OHS was improperly joined. The claim asserted against OHS in PHIs original petition is a maritime tort claim, sounding in negligence, for which PHI seeks to recover economic damages. The defendants proved that, as a matter of law, the helicopter and its float system are a single product. Accordingly, the East River doctrine precludes PHI from recovering against OHS on the negligence claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/23/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petroleum Helicopters Inc v. Apical Industries Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petroleum Helicopters Inc
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Paul M Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apical Industries Inc
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Doherty
Represented By: Kenneth H Laborde
Represented By: Tyler Davis Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Helicopter Support Services Inc
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Doherty
Represented By: Kenneth H Laborde
Represented By: Paul M Sterbcow
Represented By: Tyler Davis Trew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls Royce Corp
Represented By: Walter N Dietzen
Represented By: Howard Carter Marshall
Represented By: Kevin Richard Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?