Leleux-Thubron v. Iberia Parish Government et al

Plaintiff: Holly Leleux-Thubron
Defendant: Government of Iberia Parish, Council of Iberia Parish, Thomas J Landry, Troy F Comeaux, Bernard Broussard, Ricky J Gonsoulin, Glenn Romero, Roger Duncan, Jerome Fitch and Marty Trahan
Case Number: 6:2013cv00852
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Iberia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2015 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Sanctions, Motion to Determine Sufficiency of Defendants' Responses. It is further ORDERED that within 30 days from the entry of this order, defendants are to submit: (1) verified interrogatory answers; and, (2) verified responses to the Requests for Admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/9/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 23, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: For the reasons set out, the Motions to Disqualify Counsel (record docs 99 and 100 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 1/23/2015. (crt,GregorySld, C)
July 24, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in accordance with 51 Ruling adopting in part 43 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/24/2014. (crt,Reeves, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leleux-Thubron v. Iberia Parish Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Leleux-Thubron
Represented By: R Michael Moity, Jr(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of Iberia Parish
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Council of Iberia Parish
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Landry
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy F Comeaux
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Broussard
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky J Gonsoulin
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Romero
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Duncan
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Fitch
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Trahan
Represented By: S Gary McGoffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?