Johnson v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Johnson
Defendant: Nathan Cain and James Caldwell
Case Number: 6:2013cv02252
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 42 Second Supplemental Report and Recommendations. It is hereby ORDERED that the petition's 38 Motion to Expand the Record is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the reasons set forth in the original Report and Recommendations and because the claims are without merit. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 7/29/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 1, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING adopting Report and Recommendations re 17 Report and Recommendations. It is hereby ORDERED that the 12 Motion for Reconsideration is construed as a Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to FRCP Rule 60(b)(6) and that motion is GRAN TED IN PART in that the 11 Judgment dated 1/22/2014 is VACATED and the matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the 13 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED AT THIS TIME. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 10/1/2014. (crt,Alexander, E) Modified date filed on 10/2/2014. (Alexander, E)
January 22, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 7 Report and Recommendations,, 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Curtis Lee Johnson. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/21/14. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?