Romero v. Youngsville et al

Plaintiff: Tammy Romero
Defendant: City of Youngsville, Earl Menard, Scott Bernard, Brian Laborde, Douglas Heaton, John Does, Unknown Persons and/or Entities, A B C Insurance Co and Maurice Leblanc, Jr
Case Number: 6:2013cv02928
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 95 MOTION for Costs Pursuant filed by Maurice Leblanc, Jr, Earl Menard, Scott Bernard, Brian Laborde, Douglas Heaton, City of Youngsville. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 10/6/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 2, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to 42 U.S.C.A. Section 1988, F.R.C.P. Rule 54, and 28 U.S.C.A. Section 1927 filed by Maurice Leblanc, Jr, Earl Menard, Scott Bernard, Brian Laborde, Douglas Heaton, City of Youngsville. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/2/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
August 11, 2016 107 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 99 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 79] filed by Defendants Officers Louis Berges, Grant Thorne, and Kelley Dauphine, each in hisindividual capacity and offici al capacity as a Police Officer for the City of Youngsville is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. To the extent Defendants move for dismissal of Plaintiff Tammy L. Romeros (Romero) claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, the motion is GRANTED, and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. To the extent that Defendants move for dismissal of Romerosstate law claims, the motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portion of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 29] which remains pend ing before the Court and in which Defendants seek summary judgment on Romeros state law claims is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Romeros state law claims, and all remaining state law claims are REMANDED to the Fifteenth Judicial District Court. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/11/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
May 16, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in this Courts Ruling 84 , and for the reasons contained in the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, to the extent adopted, and after an independent review of the entire record and the written objec tions and responses filed herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 47] is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 29] is GRAN TED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. To the extent that Defendants move for summary judgment on Plaintiffs federal claims, the motion is GRANTED, and the federal claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. To the extent that Defendants move for summary judgme nt on Plaintiffs state law claims, the Court DEFERS either ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment as to those claims or declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over those claims until the pending motion to dismiss [Doc. No. 79] is fully resolved. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/16/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Youngsville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Romero
Represented By: Edward F Kohnke, IV
Represented By: Edwin G Preis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Youngsville
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Menard
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bernard
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Laborde
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Heaton
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Persons and/or Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Leblanc, Jr
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?