HealthSmart Benefit Solutions Inc v. Principia Underwriting et al

Plaintiff: HealthSmart Benefit Solutions Inc
Defendant: Principia Underwriting and Hudson Specialty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2014cv00776
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 53 Motion for Reconsideration re 51 Memorandum Ruling, 52 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 3/18/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 23, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Flectat Ltd. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/22/15. (crt,Jordan, P)
November 12, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/12/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 4, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/4/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HealthSmart Benefit Solutions Inc v. Principia Underwriting et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HealthSmart Benefit Solutions Inc
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew
Represented By: Covert J Geary
Represented By: Joseph J Lowenthal
Represented By: Gary J Russo
Represented By: Andrew Struve
Represented By: Susan Page White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principia Underwriting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Specialty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?