Richardson v. Zurich American Insurance Co

Plaintiff: Grayling Richardson
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2014cv00954
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Zurich American Insurance Co. For the following reasons, the motion is GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/2/15. As any motion seeking calculation of the offset will be referred to the Magistrate Judge, within thirty (30) days of issuance of this Ruling, the parties are ORDERED to jointly contact the Magistrate Judge for a Rule 16 conference to address the issue of calculation of the offset.(crt,Guidry, C)
July 10, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Currently pending before the Court is 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Zurich American Insurance Co. Pursuant to motion, defendant seeks dismissal with prejudice of all claims asserted against it by plaintiff, at plaintif f's cost. For the following reasons, the 8 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as premature. Additionally, the Court is of the opinion this matter should be administratively closed until a final determination is made with regard to plaintif f's entitlement to social security disability benefits. Accordingly, the parties are given 5 days from receipt of this Ruling to file any objections they have to this matter being administratively closed at this time. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/10/2015. (crt,Putch, A)
July 2, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment, It has come to the Court's attention that jurisdiction over this matter has not been established. In light of the foregoing, within 7 days of issuance of this Order, defendant, Zurich American Insurance Co is to supplement its Notice of Removal with information establishing diversity jurisdiction exists. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/1/2015. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Zurich American Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grayling Richardson
Represented By: James Steven Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Represented By: Mark R Pharr, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?