Batiste v. Quality Construction & Production L L C et al

Plaintiff: Donald Batiste
Defendant: Quality Construction & Production L L C, Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co and Arena Energy
Case Number: 6:2014cv03045
Filed: October 16, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2018 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 121 MOTION for Summary Judgmentfiled by Alliance Offshore L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, this Court grants Alliance's motion and dismisses the plaintiff's claim against Alliance with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/9/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 28, 2018 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Arena Energy L P. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained below, this Court grants Arena's motion and dismisse s the plaintiff's claim against Arena with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument on Arena's motion, which was previously scheduled for April 19, 2018, is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/28/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 26, 2018 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 105 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/26/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 7, 2018 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by W D S Global Partners L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claim against W D S is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/7/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 28, 2018 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by R C I Consultants Inc. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained below, the motion is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claim against R C I is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/28/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 21, 2018 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/21/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batiste v. Quality Construction & Production L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Batiste
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Represented By: Robert K Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Construction & Production L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?