Bellot v. Marine Surveys L L C

Plaintiff: Steven Bellot
Defendant: Marine Surveys L L C
Case Number: 6:2015cv00140
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT denying 77 MOTION for New Trial and/or MOTION to Alter Judgment and Request for Oral Arguments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 04/21/2016. (crt,Williams, L)
November 30, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Plaintiff's Seaman Status filed by Steven Bellot and 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marine Surveys L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/30/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 28, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration re 14 Memorandum Ruling on the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 04/27/2015. (crt,Yocum, M) Modified filed date on 4/29/2015 (Yocum, M).
March 30, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 3/30/15. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellot v. Marine Surveys L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bellot
Represented By: Mark L Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Surveys L L C
Represented By: Kyle L Gideon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?