Entu Auto Services Inc v. PicMyRide.Biz L L C et al

Plaintiff: Entu Auto Services Inc
Defendant: PicMyRide.Biz L L C, Aubrey King and Timmy Hendrix
Counter_claimant: Timmy Hendrix
Counter_defendant: Entu Auto Services Inc
Case Number: 6:2015cv01183
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 55 Report and Recommendations; Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by defendant, Timmy Hendrix d/b/a QUICKPICAUTO, on July 13, 2015 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, and that the fraud claim under LA CIV CODE art 1953 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/3/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
August 25, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 45 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) Motion to Continue, denying as MOOT 42 MOTION to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as PREMATURE 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP Rule 56. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/25/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 8/26/2015 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
April 13, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is granted, and this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 4/9/15. (cbn)[Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/13/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entu Auto Services Inc v. PicMyRide.Biz L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entu Auto Services Inc
Represented By: John G Alsobrook
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Represented By: Lance S Ostendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PicMyRide.Biz L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aubrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmy Hendrix
Represented By: Edward C Abell, Jr
Represented By: Lawrence L Lewis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Timmy Hendrix
Represented By: Edward C Abell, Jr
Represented By: Lawrence L Lewis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Entu Auto Services Inc
Represented By: John G Alsobrook
Represented By: Gregory D Latham
Represented By: Lance S Ostendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?