Total Rebuild, Inc. v. PHC Fluid Power L L C
Plaintiff: Total Rebuild Inc
Defendant: P H C Fluid Power L L C
Case Number: 6:2015cv01855
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 450 MEMORANDUM RULING re 445 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C, Total Rebuild Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/17/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MEMORANDUM RULING re 332 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C, 399 MOTION for Attorney Fees under 35 U.S.C. § 285 filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C, and 401 MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses, and Costs under 28 U.S.C. § 1927 filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/8/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/15/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 PRELIMINARY FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. IT IS ORDERED that the jury trial set to begin on Monday, September 16, 2019 is CANCELED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a motion for attorney fees by 9/18/19. Plaintiff's response is due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/13/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM RULING re 296 MOTION in Limine re Systems Not Identified with Specificty filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/9/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RULING re 309 MOTION to Exclude Royston Report and Preclude John W Royston filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/6/2019. (crt,MiletelloSld, A)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM RULING re 293 MOTION in Limine regarding Total's Requests for Admission Nos. 10-14 filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/29/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM RULING re 210 MOTION in Limine Regarding Certain Deposition Testimony filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/10/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 RULING AND ORDER granting 243 Motion to Strike 242 Total Rebuild Inc's Third Supplemental Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Brian A Jackson on 3/28/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER AND RULING denying 170 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian A Jackson on 3/18/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 RULING denying 151 Motion to Adopt Proposed Scheduling Order ; denying 152 Motion to Continue Trial Date; denying 153 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Brian A Jackson on 10/17/2018. (crt,Williams, L)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 RULING AND ORDER denying 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. It is Further ordered that a status conference is set for August 22, 2018 at 3:00 pm in the chambers of Judge Brian A Jackson at the Russell B Long Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 777 Florida Street, Baton Rouge, LA. the parties should be prepared to discuss when to schedule a Markman hearing. Signed by Judge Brian A Jackson on 8/14/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Total Rebuild shall pay the TOTAL SUM of $16,960.56, representing the reasonable attorneys' fees incurred by PHC in preparing and submitting matters related to 85 MOTION to Compel Defendant PHC Fluid Power, L.L.C.'s Motion to Compel Discovery Responses From Total Rebuild, Inc. MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by P H C Fluid Power L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/23/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Rebuild, Inc. v. PHC Fluid Power L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Rebuild Inc
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Represented By: Chase Anders Manuel
Represented By: William Winfield Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P H C Fluid Power L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?