Spisak v. Apache Corp et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Ben Spisak
Defendant: Apache Corp, E N I U S Operating Co Inc and Williams Energy
Case Number: 6:2015cv02305
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 33:0901
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by E N I U S Operating Co Inc, Williams Field Services L L C, 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability of Defendants ENI U.S. Operating Co. and Williams Field Services LL C filed by Timothy Ben Spisak. The plaintiff's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED to the extent that it addresses Williams's liability, the defendants' 79 Crossmotion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED to the extent that it addresses Williams's liability, and the plaintiff's claims against Williams are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. the plaintiff's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED with regard to Eni's liability, and the defendants' 70 Crossmotion for Summary Judgment is also DENIED with regard to Eni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/5/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 24, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Liability filed by Stella Maris L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/24/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 10, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apache Corp. IT IS ORDERED that Apache's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claims against Apache are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument on Apache's motion, which was previously scheduled for 3/23/2017, is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/10/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 8, 2017 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 03/08/2017. (crt,Williams, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spisak v. Apache Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ben Spisak
Represented By: Mark L Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E N I U S Operating Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?