Kocurek et al v. Franks International L L C et al

Plaintiff: Kathy Kocurek and Le Chat Interiors Inc
Defendant: Franks International L L C and Gary Luquette
Case Number: 6:2016cv00543
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Upon completion of discovery, this motion may be re-urged on the issue of lost hourly wages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 10/11/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 31, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 57 MOTION to Strike the "Amendment" of Le Chat Interiors, Inc.'s Deposition Testimony filed by Franks International L L C, Gary Luquette. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained below, the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/31/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 5, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTION. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of theparties, and for the reasons fully explained here, the 50 Motion to Compel is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/5/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kocurek et al v. Franks International L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franks International L L C
Represented By: Jeffrey Kyle Coreil
Represented By: Francis X Neuner, Jr
Represented By: Victoria Viator Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Luquette
Represented By: Jeffrey Kyle Coreil
Represented By: Francis X Neuner, Jr
Represented By: Victoria Viator Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Kocurek
Represented By: Victor R A Ashy
Represented By: J Lomax Jordan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Chat Interiors Inc
Represented By: Victor R A Ashy
Represented By: J Lomax Jordan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?