Pure Air Daigle L L C et al v. Stagg, II et al

Plaintiff: Pure Air Daigle L L C and Pure Air U S L L C
Defendant: Charles Stagg, II, Michael Scott Lanclos, Phillip Courville, Jr, Brad Guidry, Capitol Welders Supply Co Inc and St Landry Gas & Supply L L C
Case Number: 6:2016cv01322
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Landry
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2017 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/15/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 7, 2017 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 71 MOTION To Tax Costs and Award Attorneys' Fees filed by Pure Air U S L L C, Pure Air Daigle L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/7/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 6, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Brad Guidry, Charles Stagg, II, Capitol Welders Supply Co Inc, Phillip Courville, Jr, St Landry Gas & Supply L L C, Michael Scott Lanclos. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained below, the motion is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/6/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 12, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON MOTIONS: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs' 79 Motion for Additional Discovery under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) is DENIED; and IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs' 95 Motion to Compel the Deposition of Jude C. Bursavich is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/12/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Air Daigle L L C et al v. Stagg, II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Air Daigle L L C
Represented By: Joshua Paul Clayton
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Chad P Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Air U S L L C
Represented By: Joshua Paul Clayton
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Chad P Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Stagg, II
Represented By: Chelsea G Caswell
Represented By: James R Chastain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Lanclos
Represented By: Chelsea G Caswell
Represented By: James R Chastain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Courville, Jr
Represented By: Chelsea G Caswell
Represented By: James R Chastain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Guidry
Represented By: Chelsea G Caswell
Represented By: James R Chastain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Welders Supply Co Inc
Represented By: Jude C Bursavich
Represented By: Michael R Hubbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Landry Gas & Supply L L C
Represented By: Jude C Bursavich
Represented By: Michael R Hubbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?