Whitney Bank v. S M I Companies Global Inc et al

Plaintiff: Whitney Bank
Defendant: S M I Companies Global Inc and Vaughn S Lane
Case Number: 6:2016cv01427
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Ascension
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendants SMI Companies Global, Inc. and Vaughn S. Lane and for Certification as Final Judgment filed by Whitney Bank. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/14/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 31, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's 44 DAUBERT MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert, W. Timothy Finn II is DENIED without prejudice to the right of the plaintiff to reassert the motion, if appropr iate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for the plaintiff to reassert its objections to Mr. Finn's testimony, if appropriate, is the deadline for filing motions in limine, which will be taken up and resolved at the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/31/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 12, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 39 Motion to Compel. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument previously scheduled for March 22, 2018 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/12/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney Bank v. S M I Companies Global Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Bank
Represented By: Brian Wesley Capell
Represented By: Joseph P Hebert
Represented By: William Egan Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S M I Companies Global Inc
Represented By: Michael D Lopresto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn S Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?