Atakapa Indian de Creole Nation v. State of Louisiana

Plaintiff: Atakapa Indian de Creole Nation
Defendant: State of Louisiana and USA
Case Number: 6:2018cv00190
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Iberia
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Unassigned District Judge
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order 60 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Compliance Deadline set for 2/12/2019 for Plaintiff's counsel to show cause why his conduct has not violated Rule 11(b).Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/29/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 55 MEMORANDUM RULING re 54 Corrective Document, filed by Atakapa Indian de Creole Nation, 52 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Atakapa Indian de Creole Nation. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/11/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 37 JUDGMENT adopting 30 Report and Recommendations.; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and the plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/27/2018. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atakapa Indian de Creole Nation v. State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atakapa Indian de Creole Nation
Represented By: Edward Moses, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?