New Falls Corporation v. LaHaye et al
Appellee: Cindy LaHaye and Richard LaHaye
Appellant: New Falls Corp
Case Number: 6:2018cv01093
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on appeal. (crt,Doucet, M) Modified on 9/24/2018 to indicate that this was docketed in lead case 6:18-cv-0675 with a file date of 9/20/2018 (Whidden, C).
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Bankruptcy Hearing held on 8/14/2018 before Judge Robert Summerhays. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherryl Robinson, Telephone number 504-348-3704. Total pages: 23. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 10/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018. (crt,Doucet, M) Modified on 9/24/2018 to indicate that this was docketed in lead case 6:18-cv-0675, doc #17 (Whidden, C).
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with transcript request by New Falls Corp (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 1,73,82,108,113,116,132,136,141,143,144,154,158,161,168-170, #2 Claim 8, #3 BK Doc 151, #4 BK 15-51554 Docs 67,80, #5 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Doucet, M) Modified on 9/24/2018 to indicate that this entry was docketed in lead case 6:18-cv-0675, doc #16 (Whidden, C).
August 24, 2018 Cases associated. Create association to 6:18-cv-00675-UDJ-PJH. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 24, 2018 CASE Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst no longer assigned to the case. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER consolidating Lead Case 6:18-cv-0675 w/ case 6:18-cv-1093. (This order is filed as document #11 in lead case 6:18-cv-0675.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/24/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Falls Corporation. (aty,Landry, Mark)
August 22, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 8/21/18 signed by Bankruptcy Judge Robert Summerhays filed by New Falls Corporation. (Attachments: #1 BK Order Appealed, #2 BK Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Doucet, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Falls Corporation v. LaHaye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cindy LaHaye
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard LaHaye
Represented By: Thomas E St Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: New Falls Corp
Represented By: Mark C Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?