Swivel Rental & Supply L L C v. Petro Pull L L C et al

Plaintiff: Swivel Rental & Supply, L.L.C. and Swivel Rental & Supply L L C
Defendant: Petro Pull, LLC, Dow Drobish, Jason Bellard, Bacchus Lifting, LLC, Bowls, Slips & Grips, LLC d/b/a BS&G Rentals, LLC, Bacchus Lifting L L C, Petro Pull L L C and Bowls Slips & Grips L L C
Case Number: 6:2018cv01141
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #11 Notice of Motion Setting. Action taken: Terminated #11 Notice of Motion Setting and modified entry to indicate filed in error. #12 Corrected Notice of Motion Setting issued. (crt,Crick, S)
October 25, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First and Third Counterclaims of Defendants re #5 Counterclaim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 12/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
October 25, 2018 11 FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First and Third Counterclaims of Defendants re #5 Counterclaim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion day set for 12/18/2018 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 10/25/2018 to indicate filed in error. (Crick, S).
October 25, 2018 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First and Third Counterclaims of Defendants re #5 Counterclaim by Swivel Rental & Supply L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Truxillo, Douglas) Modified on 10/25/2018 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 25, 2018 9 ANSWER to #5 Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Bacchus Lifting L L C, Jason Bellard, Bowls Slips & Grips L L C, Dow Drobish, Petro Pull L L C by Swivel Rental & Supply L L C.(aty,Truxillo, Douglas) Modified on 10/25/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
October 4, 2018 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Petro Pull L L C. (aty,Anthony, Ted)
October 4, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bowls Slips & Grips L L C. (aty,Anthony, Ted)
October 4, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bacchus Lifting L L C. (aty,Anthony, Ted)
October 4, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Swivel Rental & Supply L L C by Jason Bellard, Bowls Slips & Grips L L C, Bacchus Lifting L L C, Petro Pull L L C, Dow Drobish.(Attorney Ted M Anthony added to party Bacchus Lifting L L C, Jason Bellard, Bowls Slips & Grips L L C, Dow Drobish, Petro Pull L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Anthony, Ted) Modified on 10/4/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
September 4, 2018 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bacchus Lifting L L C, Jason Bellard, Bowls Slips & Grips L L C, Dow Drobish, Petro Pull L L C (crt,Crick, S)
August 31, 2018 3 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with attachments, #2 Docket sheet) (crt,Crick, S)
August 31, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
August 31, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Swivel Rental & Supply L L C. (aty,Truxillo, Douglas) Modified on 9/4/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bacchus Lifting L L C, Jason Bellard, Bowls Slips & Grips L L C, Dow Drobish, Petro Pull L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3742435) filed by Swivel Rental & Supply L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas W Truxillo added to party Swivel Rental & Supply L L C (pty:pla))(aty,Truxillo, Douglas) Modified on 8/31/2018 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swivel Rental & Supply L L C v. Petro Pull L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Pull, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Drobish
Represented By: Ted M Anthony
Represented By: Sarah Boehme Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bellard
Represented By: Ted M Anthony
Represented By: Sarah Boehme Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacchus Lifting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowls, Slips & Grips, LLC d/b/a BS&G Rentals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacchus Lifting L L C
Represented By: Ted M Anthony
Represented By: Sarah Boehme Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Pull L L C
Represented By: Ted M Anthony
Represented By: Sarah Boehme Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowls Slips & Grips L L C
Represented By: Ted M Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swivel Rental & Supply, L.L.C.
Represented By: Douglas W Truxillo
Represented By: Seth M Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swivel Rental & Supply L L C
Represented By: Douglas W Truxillo
Represented By: Seth M Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?