Kourouma v. Warden
Plaintiff: Fode Laye Kourouma
Defendant: Warden
Case Number: 6:2018cv01150
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden Pine Prairie Correctional Center. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/24/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2018. (crt,Benoit, T)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/19/2018. (crt,HaikSld, K)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,HaikSld, K)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fode Laye Kourouma. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,HaikSld, K)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 31, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fode Laye Kourouma. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kourouma v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fode Laye Kourouma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?