Saidur v. Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Plaintiff: Rahman Saidur
Defendant: Warden and Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Case Number: 6:2018cv01180
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center. Served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT served on US Attorney. (crt,Haik, K)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center with courtesy copy to US Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts)(crt,Haik, K)
October 24, 2018 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Rahman Saidur. Clerk updated address to Pine Prairie Correctional Center, 1133 Hampton Dupre Rd, Pine Prairie, LA 70576 per envelope of doc. 1. (crt,Haik, K)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER directing clerk to prepare summons and serve by certified mail a copy of the petition and this order upon the specified parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/23/2018. (crt,Haik, K)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2018. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 17, 2018 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Rahman Saidur in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635059927. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 7, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rahman Saidur. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saidur v. Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahman Saidur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?