Forest Motel Inc et al v. Various Underwriters at Lloyds of London

Plaintiff: Albert Kuhlman, Elizabeth Forest Motel, Inc., Forest Inn and Forest Motel Inc
Defendant: Elizabeth Various Underwriters at Lloyd's of London and Various Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Case Number: 6:2018cv01208
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
0 Judge: Patrick J Hanna
1 Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 15 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 16th Judicial District Court for St. Mary Parish. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 25, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 10/25/2018. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 25, 2018 Featured Case CASE Reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to the case. Administrative entry due to order signed by Chief Judge Hicks and for statistical purposes. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 24, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #13 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Putch, A)
October 24, 2018 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Remand by Various Underwriters at Lloyds of London. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Schmid, Karl) Modified on 10/24/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
October 3, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/2/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 2, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Corporate Statement. Compliance Deadline set for 10/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/2/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 2, 2018 10 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 09:30 AM in xLafayette Court House before Unassigned District Judge. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 04:30 PM in chambers before Unassigned District Judge. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/23/2018. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/29/2018. Rule 26 Report due by 11/20/2018. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 5/23/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 4/23/2019. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 5/23/2019. Discovery deadline 6/24/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2019. Daubert Motions due by 7/22/2019. Motions in Limine due by 10/21/2019. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 10/21/2019. Pretrial Order due by 11/5/2019. Bench Books due by 11/5/2019. Trial Depositions due by 11/5/2019. Real Time glossary due by 11/12/2019. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/2/18. (crt,Guidry, C)
October 1, 2018 9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Corporate Statement with consent by Various Underwriters at Lloyds of London. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Schmid, Karl)
October 1, 2018 8 MOTION for John A. Venezia to Enroll as Counsel by Forest Motel Inc, Albert Kuhlman. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Venezia, John)
September 28, 2018 7 NOTICE of Deficiency to John Armand Venezia on behalf of Forest Motel Inc, Albert Kuhlman regarding #6 MOTION for John A. Venezia to Enroll as Counsel . Reason: This party is already represented by other counsel. Please refer to provisions under LR83.2.12 regarding appearance of other counsel to ensure compliance with this rule. A motion to enroll as co-counsel or to substitute counsel (signed by the current counsel of record) is required to remedy this situation. (crt,Putch, A)
September 28, 2018 6 DEFICIENT MOTION for John A. Venezia to Enroll as Counsel by Forest Motel Inc, Albert Kuhlman. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney John Armand Venezia added to party Forest Motel Inc and Albert Kuhlman)(aty,Venezia, John) Modified on 9/28/2018 to reflect pleading as deficient; on 10/3/2018 to remove "?" as pleading refiled in its entirety as #9 Motion (Putch, A).
September 18, 2018 5 Featured Case REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/18/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 17, 2018 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 17, 2018 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sidney W Degan, III, Genevieve K Jacques, Karl Howard Schmid on behalf of Various Underwriters at Lloyds of London. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/1/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 14, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 14, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Elizabeth Various Underwriters at Lloyd's of London.(aty,Schmid, Karl)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th St. Mary Parish, Case Number 132436 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3753407) filed by Elizabeth Various Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Attachments: #1 State court notice of filing, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Karl Howard Schmid added to party Elizabeth Various Underwriters at Lloyd's of London(pty:dft))(aty,Schmid, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forest Motel Inc et al v. Various Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Various Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By: Karl Howard Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: Genevieve K Jacques
Represented By: Sidney W Degan, III
Represented By: Karl Howard Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Kuhlman
Represented By: John Armand Venezia
Represented By: John E Sudderth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Forest Motel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Motel Inc
Represented By: John Armand Venezia
Represented By: John E Sudderth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?