Sfeir et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Co

Plaintiff: George M Sfeir and Sfair L L C
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Special Master: Gary J Russo
Case Number: 6:2018cv01237
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER. Counsel are to provide to the undersigned a very brief confidential status report on each of the cases. The reports should be very brief and are to be e-mailed to grusso@joneswalker.com by Friday, November 16, 2018. The status reports should not be filed in the record. Signed by Gary R Russo, Special Master on 11/6/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
October 15, 2018 9 NOTICE by Gary J Russo of First Discovery Case Management Order (aty,Russo, Gary)
October 12, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. The parties were provided notice by the Court at the status conference that it was considering the appointment of a Special Master, and having had an opportunity to be heard and make suggestions concerning the naming of the Special Master, with advice and consent of the parties, the Court appoints Gary J. Russo as Special Master, with overall responsibility for the case management duties described herein. Gary J Russo added. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(crt,Alexander, E)
October 12, 2018 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Martin, Mary Katherine)
October 5, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Martin, Mary Katherine)
October 5, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 State court petition A-Plaintiff's Petition)(aty,Martin, Mary Katherine)
September 21, 2018 4 Featured Case REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/21/2018. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 21, 2018 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 21, 2018 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Mary Katherine Paine Martin, Gretchen Heider Mayard on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/5/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 20, 2018 CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 20, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company answer due 9/27/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
September 20, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2018-4934-L (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3758775) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mary Katherine Paine Martin added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft))(aty,Martin, Mary Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sfeir et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mary Katherine Paine Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Represented By: Gretchen Heider Mayard
Represented By: Mary Katherine Paine Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M Sfeir
Represented By: Kaliste Joseph Saloom, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sfair L L C
Represented By: Kaliste Joseph Saloom, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Gary J Russo
Represented By: Gary J Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?