Arrow Aviation Co L L C v. H-S Tool & Parts Inc
Plaintiff: Arrow Aviation Company, LLC and Arrow Aviation Co L L C
Defendant: H-S Tool & Parts, Inc. and H-S Tool & Parts Inc
Case Number: 6:2018cv01242
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. H-S Tool & Parts Inc answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/15/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by H-S Tool & Parts Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Ulfers added to party H-S Tool & Parts Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Ulfers, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arrow Aviation Co L L C. H-S Tool & Parts Inc served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (aty,Perry, Steven)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arrow Aviation Co L L C. (aty,Perry, Steven) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Steven Brian Perry on behalf of Arrow Aviation Co L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/9/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to H-S Tool & Parts Inc (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 21, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H-S Tool & Parts Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3759839) filed by Arrow Aviation Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Steven Brian Perry added to party Arrow Aviation Company, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Perry, Steven) Modified on 9/25/2018 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrow Aviation Co L L C v. H-S Tool & Parts Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Aviation Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Aviation Co L L C
Represented By: Randall K Theunissen
Represented By: Steven Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-S Tool & Parts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-S Tool & Parts Inc
Represented By: Covert J Geary
Represented By: Christopher K Ulfers
Represented By: William J Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?