A W C Inc v. A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C
Plaintiff: A W C Inc
Defendant: A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C
Case Number: 6:2018cv01266
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
2 Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C, Elizabeth G Andrus. (aty,Shelby, Patrick)
September 28, 2018 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A W C Inc. (aty,Rubin, David)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/28/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 28, 2018 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A W C Inc. (aty,Rubin, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Louis M Phillips on behalf of A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C, David S Rubin on behalf of A W C Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 10/11/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d), on the court's own motion, based upon the court's familiarity with the proceedings as well as the current status of the case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the reference of A W C Inc v. A & B Valve & Piping System L L C, bankruptcy adversary proceeding number 16-5002 is WITHDRAWN. No proceedings in the underlying bankruptcy case shall be affected by this order. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet 16-5002)(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service filed by Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #47 Supplemental Memorandum by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 07/09/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 07/09/2018.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 46 Joint Supplemental Exhibits re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, #45 Hearing Held/Ruling by Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C, A W C Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - PO 736232, #3 Exhibit 2 - PO 744474, #4 Exhibit 3 - PO 745572, #5 Exhibit 4 - PO 749507, #6 Exhibit 5 - PO 750520, #7 Exhibit 6 - PO 752203, #8 Exhibit 7 - PO 753462, #9 Exhibit 8 - PO 757494, #10 Exhibit 9 - PO 757629, #11 Exhibit 10 - PO 757801, #12 Exhibit 11 - PO 759476, #13 Exhibit 12 - PO 759537, #14 Exhibit 13 - PO 761779, #15 Exhibit 14 - PO 761825, #16 Exhibit 15 - PO 762762, #17 Exhibit 16 - PO 762763). Originally filed in USBC on 07/09/2018.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 45 Hearing Held re #14 Motion for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #28 Trustee's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. RULING: (1) & (2) Within 45 days, the parties will submit an additional joint stipulation of certain facts. Upon that submission, the matter will be deemed Under Advisement. Originally filed in USBC on 5/15/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 44 BNC Certificate of Mailing re #43 Order Resetting Hearing. Originally filed in USBC on 03/31/2018. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Resetting Hearing re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. Hearings reset for 5/15/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, Lafayette so that the court may announce a ruling into the record. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Recipients) Originally filed in USBC on 03/29/2018.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 42 BNC Certificate of Mailing re #41 Order on Motion to Strike. Originally filed in USBC on 11/02/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying #33 Motion to Strike. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Recipients) Originally filed in USBC on 10/31/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 40 BNC Certificate of Mailing re #39 Hearing Held Adversary. Notice Date 10/28/2017. Originally filed in USBC on 10/28/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 39 Hearing Held on #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #33 MOTION to Strike #19 Exhibits, #32 Exhibit. Ruling: Matter is taken under advisement. Motion to Strike Denied. Matter taken under advisement. THE TRIAL AND ALL OTHER SCHEDULING AND FILING DEADLINES ARE VACATED AND REMOVED FROM THE DOCKET. O-SIGNED MINUTE ENTRY CONSTITUTES AN ORDER OF THE COURT. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Recipients) Originally filed in USBC on 10/24/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Originally filed in USBC on 10/19/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion with Certificate of Service re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 10/19/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Strike #19 Exhibits, #32 Exhibit with Certificate of Service filed by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 10/16/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by A W C Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Disputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibits). Originally filed in USBC on 10/09/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing Served regarding #33 MOTION to Strike with Certificate of Service. Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 at 1:30 PM at Courtroom, Lafayette. Originally filed in USBC on 09/29/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Strike #19 Exhibits, #32 Exhibits with Certificate of Service filed by Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. Originally filed in USBC on 09/29/2017. (Attorney Patrick Michael Shelby added to party Elizabeth G Andrus(pty:ip))(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 32 Additional EXHIBITS re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 09/22/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing Served regarding #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. Hearing Scheduled for 10/24/2017 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Lafayette. Clerk's entry to modify link. Originally filed in USBC on 09/15/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 30 STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts re #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibits 1 - 6, #3 Exhibits 7 - 15, #4 Exhibits 16 - 27, #5 Exhibits 28 - 37, #6 Exhibits 38 - 44). Originally filed in USBC on 09/15/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. Originally filed in USBC on 09/15/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 28 Trustee's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Certificate of Servicefiled by Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. Originally filed in USBC on 09/15/2017. (Attorney Louis M Phillips added to party Elizabeth G Andrus(pty:ip))(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service filed by Elizabeth G Andrus, Trustee for A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Disputed Material Facts, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibits 1 - 2, #4 Exhibits 3 - 7, #5 Exhibits 8 - 14). Originally filed in USBC on 09/15/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 26 Amended NOTICE of Hearing Served with Certificate of Service regarding: #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by A W C Inc. Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 at 1:30 PM at Courtroom, Lafayette. Originally filed in USBC on 08/18/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #24 Additional Exhibits by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 08/17/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 24 Additional EXHIBITS re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by A W C Inc. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of J David Honeycutt Part 1, #2 Deposition Transcript of J David Honeycutt Part 2, #3 Deposition Transcript of J David Honeycutt Part 3, #4 Deposition Transcript of Charli Miller, #5 Deposition Transcript of Lionel Johnston Part 1, #6 Deposition Transcript of Lionel Johnston Part 2, #7 Deposition Transcript of Lionel Johnston Part 3, #8 Deposition Transcript of Jorge Diaz, #9 Deposition Transcript of Tara Ramos Part 1, #10 Deposition Transcript of Tara Ramos Part 2, #11 Deposition Transcript of Simon Wachsberg). Originally filed in USBC on 08/17/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 23 ENTERED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #22 Notice of Filing Additional Exhibits by A W C Inc. Clerk modified to indicate entered in error. Originally filed in USBC on 08/17/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 ENTERED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO REFILE. NOTICE of Filing of Additional Exhibits re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Statement of Material Facts by A W C Inc. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of J David Honeycutt Part 1, #2 Deposition Transcript of J David Honeycutt Part 2, #3 Deposition Transcript of J David Honeycutt Part 3, #4 Deposition Transcript of Charli Miller, #5 Deposition Transcript of Lionel Johnston Part 1, #6 Deposition Transcript of Lionel Johnston Part 2, #7 Deposition Transcript of Lionel Johnston Part 3, #8 Deposition Transcript of Jorge Diaz, #9 Deposition Transcript of Tara Ramos Part 1, #10 Deposition Transcript of Tara Ramos Part 2, #11 Deposition Transcript of Simon Wachsberg). Clerk modified to indicate filed in error. Originally filed in USBC on 08/17/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Statement of Material Facts, #17 Notice of Hearing Served, #19 Exhibits, #20 Notice of Hearing Served by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 08/16/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing Served regarding: #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service by A W C Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/19/2017 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Lafayette. Clerk's entry modified link. Originally filed in USBC on 08/16/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing of Additional Exhibit (Exhibit 39) re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 08/16/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Statement of Material Facts, #17 Notice of Motion Setting by A W C Inc. Clerk modified entry to amend notice to include names and addresses of parties served. Originally filed in USBC on 08/15/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing Served regarding: #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service by A W C Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/19/2017 at 01:30 PM at First Floor Courtroom, 214 Jefferson St. Clerk's entry modified hearing location from 341 Meeting Room to First Floor Courtroom on 08/16/2017. Originally filed in USBC on 08/15/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 STATEMENT of Uncontested Material Facts re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by A W C Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J David Honeycutt, #2 Index to Exhibits & Exhibits 1 - 5, #3 Exhibits 6 - 8, #4 Exhibits 9 - 14, #5 Exhibits 15 - 18, #6 Exhibits 19 - 24, #7 Exhibits 25 - 38, #8 Deposition Excerpts Exhibits 1 - 24). Originally filed in USBC on 08/15/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 08/15/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certificate of Service by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 08/15/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Answer to Complaint by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 03/27/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 Supplemental Affirmative Defense to First Amended & Supplemental Reconventional Demand by A W C Inc. (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to First Amended & Supplemental Reconventional Demand filed in state court on August 12, 2015.) Originally filed in USBC on 03/27/2017.(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing re #10 Scheduling Order. Originally filed in USBC on 03/26/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER from PTC Limiting Time for Completion of Discovery and Scheduling Trial. Pre-Trial/Dispositive Motion(s) due by 10/15/2017. Answer Amended Pleading(s) due by 4/28/2017. Pre-Trial Order due by 11/17/2017. Discovery due by 8/31/2017. Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/1/2017 at 10:00 AM at Chambers, Judge Summerhays. Trial date set for 12/11/2017 at 9:00 AM at Courtroom, Lafayette. Originally filed in USBC on 03/24/2017. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 3/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Recipients)(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Status Conference Held; RULING: Parties will submit an agreed scheduling order. Originally filed in USBC on 05/13/2016. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing re #7 Order Setting Status Conference. Originally filed in USBC on 04/17/2016. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Fixing Telephone Status Conference re #1 Notice of Removal set for 5/13/2016 09:30 AM before Judge Summerhays. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 4/15/2016. Originally filed in USBC on 04/15/2016.(crt,Crick, S) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2018: #1 Notice to Recipients) (Crick, S).
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Chronological List & Certification of State Court Record re #3 Order by A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. Originally filed in USBC on 02/22/2016. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Bankruptcy Court Filing Fee Paid. Receipt Number 50097570, Amount Paid $350.00 Re #1 Notice of Removal. Originally docketed in USBC on 01/27/2016. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 BNC Certificate of Mailing re #3 Order. Originally filed in USBC on 01/23/2016. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Statement of Compliance re #3 Order by A W C Inc. Originally filed in USBC on 01/22/2016. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Procedural Requirements on a Removed Action re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 1/20/2016. Originally filed in USBC on 01/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal State Court Record by A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. Originally filed in USBC on 01/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of State Court Record) (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 Adversary case 16-05002. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC, Case Number C-2013-5329 filed by A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil (Adversary) cover sheet)(crt,Crick, S) Modified on 9/26/2018 to indicate originally filed in USBC on 01/14/2016. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A W C Inc v. A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & B Valve & Piping Systems L L C
Represented By: Louis M Phillips
Represented By: Patrick Michael Shelby
Represented By: Peter A Kopfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A W C Inc
Represented By: David S Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?