Ibrahim v. Immigration & Customs Enforcement et al

Plaintiff: Ghassan Jamil Ibrahim
Defendant: Kristin Nielson, Jeff Sessions, Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security and Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 6:2018cv01485
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Ghassan Jamil Ibrahim, Pine Prairie Correctional Center, re: #3 Copy Work or Form Request returned marked: Return to Sender, inmate not found. (crt,Haik, K)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Ghassan Jamil Ibrahim, Pine Praire Correctional Center, re: #2 Memorandum Order, returned marked: Return to Sender; Inmate not found. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST from Ghassan Jamil Ibrahim for status update. Clerk mailed copy of Docket Sheet on 12/27/2018. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Devillier, W)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/19/2018. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
November 13, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 54635060301, filing fee $5) filed by Ghassan Jamil Ibrahim. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibrahim v. Immigration & Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghassan Jamil Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?