Gautreaux v. Johnston et al

Plaintiff: Robert J. Gautreaux and Robert J Gautreaux
Defendant: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Co, Anita Johnston and Farmers Insurance Exchange
Intervenor Plaintiff: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2018cv01613
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Patrick J Hanna
1 Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, with Jury Demand filed 10/1/2018 in 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number 18-2962 by Farmers Insurance Exchange and Anita Johnston. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see Attachment #2 to #6 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 7, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed 9/24/2018 in 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number 18-2962 by Farmers Insurance Exchange and Anita Johnston. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see Attachment #2 to #6 Response to Removal Order. (Attorney Jack Etherton Truitt added to party Farmers Insurance Exchange(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 7, 2019 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Anita Johnston and Farmers Insurance Exchange filed 7/30/2018 in 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number 18-2962 by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY, see Attachment #2 to #6 Response to Removal Order.(Attorney Kyle Matthew Beasley added to party Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co(pty:intvp))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Co, Anita Johnston . (Attachments: #1 Certificate #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Truitt, Jack) Modified on 1/8/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Truitt, Jack) Modified on 12/21/2018 to edit text (Williams, L).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/14/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Peter Martin Gahagan, Lou Anne Milliman, Michelle Mayne Davis, Nancy N Butcher, Jack Etherton Truitt, Amber Leigh Mitchell on behalf of Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 13, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC St. Landry Parish, Case Number 18-2962 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3829417) filed by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Co, Anita Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A-C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jack Etherton Truitt added to party Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Jack Etherton Truitt added to party Anita Johnston(pty:dft))(aty,Truitt, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gautreaux v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Amber Leigh Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Martin Gahagan
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Represented By: Michelle Mayne Davis
Represented By: Lou Anne Milliman
Represented By: Nancy N Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Johnston
Represented By: Amber Leigh Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Martin Gahagan
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Represented By: Michelle Mayne Davis
Represented By: Lou Anne Milliman
Represented By: Nancy N Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Amber Leigh Mitchell
Represented By: Peter Martin Gahagan
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Represented By: Michelle Mayne Davis
Represented By: Lou Anne Milliman
Represented By: Nancy N Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Gautreaux
Represented By: G Douglas Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Gautreaux
Represented By: G Douglas Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?