Jalbert v. DKFM Switzerland AG
Plaintiff: Craig Jalbert
Defendant: D K F M Switzerland A G
Case Number: 6:2018cv01626
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 CORRECTED NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 1/9/2019 to indicate filed in error SEE #3 Corrected Notice of Motion Setting (FinnSld, P).
December 18, 2018 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on Withdrawal of Reference. (crt,Tizeno, J)
December 14, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference with docket entries received FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Brent Barriere on behalf of Plaintiff, Craig Jalbert, Chapter 11 Liquidating Trustee. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet)(crt,Tizeno, J) Modified on 12/19/2018 to capture motion event (FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jalbert v. DKFM Switzerland AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Jalbert
Represented By: Degan Skylar Rosenbloom
Represented By: Catherine Elena Lasky
Represented By: Brent B Barriere
Represented By: Jason W Burge
Represented By: Kerry A Murphy
Represented By: Rebekka C Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D K F M Switzerland A G
Represented By: Tristan Manthey
Represented By: Cherie Dessauer Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?