Marcotte et al v. Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Byrd Marcotte and Joseph W Marcotte
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co, Alliance Security Systems L L C, A D T Security Systems Inc, X Y Z Insurance Co, A D T Security Services South Inc, A D T Security Services, Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C and A D T L L C
Case Number: 6:2018cv01658
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by A D T L L C, Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C.(Attorney Arthur W Landry added to party Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Landry, Arthur)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDING COMPLAINT against A B C Insurance Co, Alliance Security Systems L L C, Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co with Jury Demand filed by Joseph W Marcotte, Stacey Byrd Marcotte.(crt,Putch, A)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Leave to File Third Supplemental & Amending Complaint. The #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED without prejudice with Defendant's right to re-urge if appropriate after review of Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/11/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Third Supplemental & Amending Complaint re #11 Second Amended Complaint with consent by Joseph W Marcotte, Stacey Byrd Marcotte. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,Ledet, Eugene) Modified on 2/8/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A D T Security Services South Inc, A D T Security Systems Inc, Alliance Security Systems L L C (crt,Crick, S)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against A B C Insurance Co, A D T L L C, A D T Security Services South Inc, A D T Security Systems Inc, Alliance Security Systems L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co filed by Joseph W Marcotte, Stacey Byrd Marcotte.(crt,Crick, S)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Second Amending Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/18/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph W Marcotte. (aty,Ledet, Eugene)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Eugene A Ledet, Jr on behalf of Joseph W Marcotte, Stacey Byrd Marcotte regarding ATTACHMENT #1 to #8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amending Complaint. Action taken: Modified entry to reflect ATTACHMENT #1 AS FILED IN ERROR; Counsel is reminded that multiple pleadings should not be combined and should be filed separately. If this document should be filed in the record, please refile the memorandum using the proper event. (crt,Putch, A)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amending Complaint with consent by Joseph W Marcotte, Stacey Byrd Marcotte. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR-WRONG PDF -Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,Ledet, Eugene) Modified on 1/17/2019 to edit filers and to reflect attachment #1 as filed in error (Putch, A).
January 9, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of A D T L L C in the amount of $400.00, receipt number 54635060779. (crt,Adams, K)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Putch, A)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by A D T L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of ADT LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Contract)(aty,Landry, Arthur)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Arthur W Landry on behalf of A D T L L C regarding #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Action taken: Modified entry to reflect Formatting Error and counsel to resubmit electronic filing in proper format. (crt,Putch, A)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 FORMATTING ERROR - Counsel requested to resubmit - MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by A D T L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of ADT LLC's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Contract)(aty,Landry, Arthur) Modified on 1/7/2019 to reflect as formatting error. (Putch, A).
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/3/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
January 2, 2019 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:18-cv-01658 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:18-cv-01658. (crt,Mitchell, P)
December 28, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Mitchell, P)
December 28, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 13th JDC, Parish of Evangeline. Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C answer due 1/4/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 TO DOCUMENT #1 , NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (crt,Mitchell, P)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A D T L L C, d/b/a Security Services, Inc. (aty,Landry, Arthur) Modified on 1/2/2019 to correct party name who filed this. (Mitchell, P)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Evangeline Parish, Case Number 778-A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3839998) filed by A D T L L C, d/b/a A D T Security Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State Records, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Arthur W Landry added to party ADT Security Services South, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Landry, Arthur) Modified on 1/2/2019 to correct the filer name. (Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcotte et al v. Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Security Systems L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A D T Security Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A D T Security Services South Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A D T Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Security Solutions L L C
Represented By: Arthur W Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A D T L L C
Represented By: Arthur W Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Byrd Marcotte
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Laura B Knoll
Represented By: Eugene A Ledet, Jr
Represented By: Brock Hadyn Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W Marcotte
Represented By: Brian M Caubarreaux
Represented By: Laura B Knoll
Represented By: Eugene A Ledet, Jr
Represented By: Brock Hadyn Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?