Greene et al v. Zurich American Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Forrest Greene, Jr, Avril Greene, Breanna Greene and Laura Greene
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv00018
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2020 09:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 3/6/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/11/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 4/3/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/20/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/21/2019. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/20/2019. Discovery deadline 10/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2019. Daubert Motions due by 11/19/2019. Motions in Limine due by 2/18/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 2/18/2020. Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2020. Bench Books due by 3/4/2020. Trial Depositions due by 3/4/2020. Real Time glossary due by 3/11/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 3/11/2020.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 2/13/2019. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Zurich American Insurance Co of Compliance re #4 Removal Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 1-10)(aty,Peytavin, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/9/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Co of America Inc, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Co. (aty,Peytavin, Michael)
January 7, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 7, 2019 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(crt,Thigpen, M)
January 7, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC Iberia Parish, Case Number 133214 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3844645) filed by Zurich American Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, #3 Exhibit List of Attorneys, #4 Exhibit Index of exhibits, #5 Exhibit Exh 1 State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit 2 Proof of Loss)(Attorney Michael Don Peytavin added to party Zurich American Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Peytavin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene et al v. Zurich American Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael Don Peytavin
Represented By: Laura Welch Christensen
Represented By: Thomas W Darling
Represented By: William Donley Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Greene, Jr
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Jeanette Elizabeth DeWitt
Represented By: Deil J Lalande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avril Greene
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Jeanette Elizabeth DeWitt
Represented By: Deil J Lalande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Greene
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Jeanette Elizabeth DeWitt
Represented By: Deil J Lalande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Greene
Represented By: Patrick Jody Lavergne
Represented By: Russell J Stutes, Jr
Represented By: Jeanette Elizabeth DeWitt
Represented By: Deil J Lalande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?