Q Apartments DK A/S v. Thomson et al
Plaintiff: Q Apartments DK A/S and Q Apartments D K A/S
Defendant: Roderick Thomson, Miller Thomson & Partners, LLC, Marsden William Miller, Miller Thomson Inc and Miller Thomson & Partners L L C
Undetermined: Miller Thomson Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00041
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 4/30/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/5/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Miller Thomson & Partners L L C, Miller Thomson Inc. (aty,Abell, Edward)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Answer to Complaint, sent to Edward C Abell, Jr on behalf of Miller Thomson & Partners L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/15/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marsden William Miller, Miller Thomson & Partners L L C, Miller Thomson Inc.(Attorney Edward C Abell, Jr added to party Marsden William Miller, Miller Thomson & Partners L L C and Miller Thomson Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Abell, Edward) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Mr Miller's request to extend his deadline to answer the complaint is GRANTED, and he shall file his answer on or before March 1, 2019. The request to extend the deadline for the filing of answers by Miller Thomson & Partners L L C and Miller Thomson Inc is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/20/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Marsden William Miller. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Q Apartments D K A/S. Miller Thomson Inc served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 6 Certificate of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 1/29/2019 to add document number. (Crick, S).
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Q Apartments D K A/S. Miller Thomson & Partners L L C served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 5 Certificate of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 1/29/2019 to add document number. (Crick, S).
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Q Apartments D K A/S. Marsden William Miller served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as document electronically filed in error as 4 Certificate of Service. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 1/29/2019 to add document number. (Crick, S).
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marsden William Miller, Miller Thomson & Partners L L C, Miller Thomson Inc, Roderick Thomson (crt,Crick, S)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Q Apartments D K A/S. (aty,Large, William) Modified on 1/15/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marsden William Miller, Miller Thomson & Partners L L C, Miller Thomson Inc, Roderick Thomson with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3850181) filed by Q Apartments D K A/S. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney William Frederick Large added to party Q Apartments D K A/S(pty:pla))(aty,Large, William) Modified on 1/15/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Q Apartments DK A/S v. Thomson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Thomson & Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsden William Miller
Represented By: Lawrence L Lewis, III
Represented By: Edward C Abell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Thomson Inc
Represented By: Lawrence L Lewis, III
Represented By: Edward C Abell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Thomson & Partners L L C
Represented By: Lawrence L Lewis, III
Represented By: Edward C Abell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Apartments DK A/S
Represented By: William Frederick Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Apartments D K A/S
Represented By: William Frederick Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Miller Thomson Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?