G E Oil & Gas L L C v. Waguespack Trustee et al
Plaintiff: G E Oil & Gas L L C
Defendant: MBM 2011 DOH GRAT, MBM Family Trust No 1, Jesus Moreno Trustee, William W Ruck IV Trustee, MBM 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, TCM 2011 MGH GRAT, Dalis Moreno Waguespack Trustee, TCM 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, Moreno Childrens Trust, MBM 2011 MGH GRAT, TCM 2011 DOH GRAT, M B M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, T C M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, M B M Family Trust No 1, William W Rucks, IV, T C M 2011 D O H G R A T, M B M 2011 D O H G R A T, M B M 2011 M G H G R A T, Dalis Moreno Waguespack, T C M 2011 M G H G R A T and Jesus Moreno
Case Number: 6:2019cv00054
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to John M Duck on behalf of G E Oil & Gas L L C regarding #7 Waiver of Service Executed. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect service date and asnwer due date as no dates were entered at the time of e-filing. Dalis Moreno Waguespack, Trustee waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; William W Ruck, IV, Trustee waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Jesus Moreno, Trustee waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; M B M 2001 D O H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; T C M 2011 D O H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019; answer due 4/22/2019; M B M 2011 M G H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; T C M 2011 M G H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Moreno Childrens Trust waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; M B M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1 waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; T C M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1 waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; and, M B M Family Trust No 1 waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by G E Oil & Gas L L C. Dalis Moreno Waguespack, Trustee waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; William W Ruck, IV, Trustee waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Jesus Moreno, Trustee waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; M B M 2001 D O H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; T C M 2011 D O H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019; answer due 4/22/2019; M B M 2011 M G H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; T C M 2011 M G H G R A T waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Moreno Childrens Trust waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; M B M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1 waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; T C M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1 waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; and, M B M Family Trust No 1 waiver sent 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (aty,Duck, John) Modified to correct service and answer deadline dates as no service date or answer date was entered at the time of e-filing on 3/7/2019 (Bunting, M).
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G E Oil & Gas L L C. M B M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1 served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (aty,Duck, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by G E Oil & Gas L L C. Moreno Childrens Trust served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019; William W Rucks, IV served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(aty,Duck, John)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G E Oil & Gas L L C identifying Corporate Parent Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Other Affiliate General Electric Co, Other Affiliate Baker Hughes a G E Co for G E Oil & Gas L L C. (aty,Duck, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to M B M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, M B M 2011 D O H G R A T, M B M 2011 M G H G R A T, M B M Family Trust No 1, Jesus Moreno, Moreno Childrens Trust, William W Rucks, IV, T C M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, T C M 2011 D O H G R A T, T C M 2011 M G H G R A T, Dalis Moreno Waguespack (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to John M Duck on behalf of G E Oil & Gas L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/31/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,FinnSld, P)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M B M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, M B M 2011 D O H G R A T, M B M 2011 M G H G R A T, M B M Family Trust No 1, Moreno Childrens Trust, Jesus Moreno, William W Rucks IV, T C M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1, T C M 2011 D O H G R A T, T C M 2011 M G H G R A T, Dalis Moreno Waguespack Trustee (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3851429) filed by G E Oil & Gas L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John M Duck added to party G E Oil & Gas L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Duck, John) Modified on 1/17/2019 to edit text(FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G E Oil & Gas L L C v. Waguespack Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G E Oil & Gas L L C
Represented By: John M Duck
Represented By: Lisa Merz Hedrick
Represented By: Graham H Williams
Represented By: Mark R Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBM 2011 DOH GRAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBM Family Trust No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Moreno Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W Ruck IV Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBM 2008 Childrens Trust No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCM 2011 MGH GRAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalis Moreno Waguespack Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCM 2008 Childrens Trust No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno Childrens Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBM 2011 MGH GRAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCM 2011 DOH GRAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M B M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C M 2008 Childrens Trust No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M B M Family Trust No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W Rucks, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C M 2011 D O H G R A T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M B M 2011 D O H G R A T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M B M 2011 M G H G R A T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalis Moreno Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C M 2011 M G H G R A T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?