Thymes v. Trustee
Appellant: Cornelius Thymes
Appellee: U S Trustee
Case Number: 6:2019cv00093
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Trustee is allowed an extension of time to file his brief until March 31, 2019. Appellee Brief due by 3/31/2019. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 3/11/19. (crt,Guidry, C)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. Consideration of Bankruptcy Appeal set for 7/18/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of To File Brief with consent Appellee's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time To File Brief and Certificate of Gail B. McCulloch by U S Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McCulloch, Gail)
March 1, 2019 BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on appeal. (crt,Doucet, M)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Bankruptcy Hearing held on 12/18/2018 before Judge John W. Kolwe. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherryl Robinson, Telephone number 504-348-3704. Volume 1. Page range: 1-9. Total pages: 9. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 3/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2019. (crt,Doucet, M)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Bankruptcy Hearing held on 10/23/2018 before Judge John W. Kolwe. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherryl Robinson, Telephone number 504-348-3704. Volume 1. Page range: 1-12. Total pages: 12. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 3/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2019. (crt,Doucet, M)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by Cornelius Thymes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) Bankruptcy Clerk Certification of Completion, #4 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) Notice of Setting Bankruptcy Appeal. Action taken: As a result of the filing of the Designation of Record with Transcript Request by the U S Trustee ON 2/14/2019 docket text edited to reflect Electronically Filed in Error. Upon the filing of the transcript USBC will certify the completion of the record and a notice of motion setting shall issue at that time. Hearing of 5/16/2019 terminated. (crt,Williams, L)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with transcript request by U S Trustee (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docs 1,3,5,11,14,16,18,22, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(crt,Williams, L)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Consideration of Bankruptcy Appeal set for 5/16/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 2/14/2019 to reflect Filed in Error - record is incomplete as a result of the Designation of Record filed by U S Trustee with transcript request on 2/14/19 (Williams, L).
January 31, 2019 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) BANKRUPTCY CLERK Certification of Completion of record on appeal. (crt,Doucet, M) Modified on 2/14/2019 to reflect Filed in Error - premature)(Williams, L).
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record and Statement of Issues re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Cornelius Thymes (Attachments: #1 BK Doc 15,19,23-25,28, #2 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Doucet, M)
January 30, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #2 Notice of Setting Bankruptcy Appeal. Action taken: Modified docket entry to indicate Notice is "Vacated" as document was filed in error. An appropriate Notice of Setting will be issued in due course. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 (VACATED) NOTICE of Setting #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,Thigpen, M) Modified on 1/30/2019 to indicate Notice is "Vacated" as document was filed in error. An appropriate Notice of Setting will be issued in due course (Dauterive, C).
January 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 1/15/19 signed by Bankruptcy Judge John W Kolwe filed by Cornelius Thymes. (Attachments: #1 BK Order Appealed, #2 BK Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #3 Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, #4 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Tizeno, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thymes v. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cornelius Thymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U S Trustee
Represented By: Gail Bowen McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?