Freeman v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Bernadine L Freeman
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2019cv00144
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by Bernadine L Freeman. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Bernadine L Freeman. U S Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/12/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Return)(crt,FinnSld, P)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/7/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by Bernadine L Freeman. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT "G" re #1 Complaint by Bernadine L Freeman. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/6/2019) (Thigpen, M).
February 4, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bernadine L Freeman. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security filed by Bernadine L Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits A-F)(crt,ThomasSld, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine L Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?