Mr Row L L C v. S B N V F N B C L L C et al
Appellee: Seatran Marine L L C, Steve J Miguez and S B N V F N B C L L C
Appellant: Mr Row L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv00359
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT granting #10 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Appeal. The appeal is Dismissed With Prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/18/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Mr Row L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Draper, Douglas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT: BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record, Document #113 re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Mr Row L L C. (crt,Putch, A)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Bankruptcy held on 12/18/2018 before Judge John W Kolwe. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherryl Robinson, Telephone number 504-585-3814. Total pages: 301. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 3/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2019. (crt,Comeaux, M) Modified on 4/9/2019 to correct file date and hearing judge (Whidden, C).
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Row L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet Part 2 of 2 Docs 97-198)(crt,Comeaux, M) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Row L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet Part 1 of 2 Docs 1-96)(crt,Comeaux, M) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Row L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Doc 150 Part 7 of 12, #2 BK Doc 150 Part 8 of 12, #3 BK Doc 150 Part 9 of 12, #4 BK Doc 150 Part 10 of 12, #5 BK Doc 150 Part 11 of 12, #6 BK Doc 150 Part 12 of 12)(crt,Comeaux, M)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Row L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Doc 150 Part 1 of 12, #2 BK Doc 150 Part 2 of 12, #3 BK Doc 150 Part 3 of 12, #4 BK Doc 150 Part 4 of 12, #5 BK Doc 150 Part 5 of 12, #6 BK Doc 150 Part 6 of 12)(crt,Comeaux, M)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Row L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 114,115, #2 Bk Docs 130,131,137,138,139,152, #3 BK Doc 163)(crt,Comeaux, M)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Row L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 29,30,34,43,48,52,93,116, #2 BK Doc 94, #3 BK Doc 112 Part 1 of 6, #4 BK Doc 112 Part 2 of 6, #5 BK Doc 112 Part 3 of 6, #6 BK Doc 112 Part 4 of 6, #7 BK Doc 112 Part 5 of 6, #8 BK Doc 112 Part 6 of 6)(crt,Comeaux, M)
March 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 3/7/19 signed by Bankruptcy Judge John W Kolwe filed by Mr Row LLC. (Attachments: #1 BK Order Appealed, #2 BK Notice of filing notice of appeal, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Doucet, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mr Row L L C v. S B N V F N B C L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Seatran Marine L L C
Represented By: Stewart F Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steve J Miguez
Represented By: Stewart F Peck
Represented By: Benjamin W Kadden
Represented By: Meredith Sue Grabill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: S B N V F N B C L L C
Represented By: David F Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mr Row L L C
Represented By: Douglas S Draper
Represented By: Leslie A Collins
Represented By: Greta M Brouphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?