Mliscogen v. Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Plaintiff: Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen and Maddaux Delaucum Quandt
Defendant: Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Case Number: 6:2019cv00362
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen, Pine Prairie Correctional Center, re: #16 Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely returned marked: Return to Sender. (crt,Haik, K)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/27/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT re #13 MOTION to Release from Detention at ICE by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Williams, L)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support entitled "Out Release Immigration Custody Motion" re #13 MOTION to Release from Detention at ICE filed by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Release from Detention at ICE by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #11 Motion to Claim Economic Damage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/13/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Claim Economic Damage by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,HaikSld, K)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support entitled "Petition to Release from Ice Detention" by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 DUPLICATE CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT filed by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,HaikSld, K)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/12/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled accounts officer page filed by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen. (No accounts officer page. Clerk resent accounts officer page to plaintiff with a note stating it must be completed.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K) Modified to remove deficiency notation on 4/11/2019 (Haik, K).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) Application not on approved forms.
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mliscogen v. Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldorse Horigorde Mliscogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maddaux Delaucum Quandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Prairie I C E Processing Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?