Reaux v. Couvillion et al

Plaintiff: Dominique E Reaux
Defendant: Kurk Fritz and Mike Couvillion
Case Number: 6:2019cv00469
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Dominique E Reaux. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's Civil Rights Complaint be DISMISSED in accordance with the provisions of FRCP Rule 41(b). Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/27/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint. Pro Se Response due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/23/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/22/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/22/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dominique E Reaux. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dominique E Reaux. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Couvillion, Kurk Fritz filed by Dominique E Reaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaux v. Couvillion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurk Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Couvillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique E Reaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?