Fontanilla et al v. Ace American Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Jesus Fontanilla and Maidelyn Carrera
Defendant: Donald Young, Ace American Insurance Co, J B Hunt Transport Inc, Truckmovers.com Inc and Dealers Choice Truckaway System Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00481
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Truckmovers.com Inc identifying Corporate Parent Dealers Choice Truckaway System Inc for Truckmovers.com Inc. (aty,Preis, Edwin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ace American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Chubb Ltd, Chubb I N A Holdings Inc, Chubb Group Holdings Inc, I N A Holdings Corp, I N A Financial Corp, I N A Corp for Ace American Insurance Co. (aty,Preis, Edwin) Modified on 6/21/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace American Insurance Co, Truckmovers.com Inc.(Attorney Edwin G Preis, Jr added to party Ace American Insurance Co(pty:dft), Truckmovers.com Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Preis, Edwin) Modified on 6/21/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Truckmovers.com Inc (crt,Crick, S)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ace American Insurance Co, Truckmovers.com Inc, Donald Young filed by Jesus Fontanilla, Maidelyn Carrera.(aty,Ryan, James) Modified on 5/7/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ace American Insurance Co, J B Hunt Transport Inc, Donald Young. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ace American Insurance Co, J B Hunt Transport Inc, and Donald Young. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3925777) filed by Jesus Fontanilla, Maidelyn Carrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James P Ryan added to party Maidelyn Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney James P Ryan added to party Jesus Fontanilla(pty:pla))(aty,Ryan, James) Modified on 4/16/2019 to add defendants (Whidden, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontanilla et al v. Ace American Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Fontanilla
Represented By: William Lewis Ryan
Represented By: James P Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maidelyn Carrera
Represented By: William Lewis Ryan
Represented By: James P Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Co
Represented By: Edwin G Preis, Jr
Represented By: Karnina Dargin King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Hunt Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truckmovers.com Inc
Represented By: Edwin G Preis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealers Choice Truckaway System Inc
Represented By: Edwin G Preis, Jr
Represented By: Karnina Dargin King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?