Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Bartab L L C et al
Plaintiff: E M I Blackwood Music Inc, Velvet Apple Music, Sony A T V Songs L L C, Still Working For the Man Music Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, Garden Angel Music, Constant Pressure Publishing, Sams Jammin Songs, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Combine Music Corp, Broadcast Music Inc and Suffer In Silence Music
Defendant: Justin Menard, Bartab L L C, Troy Breaux and Darren Parker
Case Number: 6:2019cv00502
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bartab L L C and Justin Menard.(aty,Goudelocke, Ryan) Modified on 7/8/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Bartab L L C answer due 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/27/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Bartab L L C, Troy Breaux, Justin Menard, Darren Parker. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Goudelocke, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bartab L L C. (aty,Goudelocke, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Bartab L L C answer due 6/28/2019; Troy Breaux answer due 6/28/2019; Justin Menard answer due 6/28/2019; Darren Parker answer due 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/28/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Ryan M Goudelocke on behalf of Bartab L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/11/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent by Bartab L L C, Troy Breaux, Justin Menard, Darren Parker. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consent, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Ryan M Goudelocke added to party Bartab L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan M Goudelocke added to party Troy Breaux(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan M Goudelocke added to party Justin Menard(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan M Goudelocke added to party Darren Parker(pty:dft))(aty,Goudelocke, Ryan) Modified on 5/28/2019 to edit text (Williams, L).
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights with attachments. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bartab L L C, Troy Breaux, Justin Menard and Darren Parker. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music Inc, Combine Music Corp., Constant Pressure Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Garden Angel Music, Rondor Music International Inc, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Suffer In Silence Music, Velvet Apple Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp identifying Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. for Combine Music Corp.; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment Inc for Sony/ATV Songs, LLC ; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International Inc; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music Inc. (aty,Balkin, Mark)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bartab L L C, Troy Breaux, Justin Menard and Darren Parker (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3928728) filed by Sony A T V Songs L L C, Still Working For The Man Music Inc, Rondor Music International Inc, Broadcast Music Inc, Sams Jammin Songs, Garden Angel Music, Boy Meets Girl Music, Combine Music Corp, Suffer In Silence Music, Constant Pressure Publishing, E M I Blackwood Music Inc, Velvet Apple Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Proposed summons/writ, #5 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Boy Meets Girl Music(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Broadcast Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Combine Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Constant Pressure Publishing(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Garden Angel Music(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Rondor Music International Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Sams Jammin Songs(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Sony/ATV Songs, LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Still Working For The Man Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Suffer In Silence Music(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Velvet Apple Music(pty:pla), Attorney Mark A Balkin added to party Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp(pty:pla))(aty,Balkin, Mark) Modified on 4/22/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Inc et al v. Bartab L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Menard
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartab L L C
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Breaux
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Parker
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E M I Blackwood Music Inc
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velvet Apple Music
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony A T V Songs L L C
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Still Working For the Man Music Inc
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International Inc
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boy Meets Girl Music
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Angel Music
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constant Pressure Publishing
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sams Jammin Songs
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Inc
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suffer In Silence Music
Represented By: Joseph C Chautin, III
Represented By: Mark A Balkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?