Boudreaux v. Bidros

Plaintiff: Jeffery J Boudreaux
Defendant: Dani Bidros
Case Number: 6:2019cv00506
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
2 Judge: Michael J Juneau
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J Juneau. Judge Terry A Doughty no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Judge Doughty are hereby reset before Judge Juneau. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr.(crt,Whidden, C)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffery J Boudreaux. Dani Bidros waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (aty,Schoeffler, Gordon)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dani Bidros (crt,JonesSld, P)
April 18, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,JonesSld, P)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dani Bidros (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3928809) filed by Jeffery Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Joseph R Joy, III added to party Jeffery Boudreaux(pty:pla))(aty,Joy, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Bidros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery J Boudreaux
Represented By: Gordon James Schoeffler
Represented By: Joseph R Joy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dani Bidros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?