Morris v. Shetty et al
Plaintiff: Reginald T Morris
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Lafayette Parish, Deputy Shetty, Lafayette Parish Correctional Center, 15th Judicial District Court and Judge Marilyn Castle
Case Number: 6:2019cv00528
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Reginald T Morris, LaSalle Correctional Facility, re: (10 in 6:19-cv-00546-MJJ-PJH) Notice of Change of Address, returned marked: Return to Sender. Action taken: Clerk updated plaintiff's DOC# to 353176 per doc. 16 in civil action 1:18-1322 and resent documents to plaintiff at LaSalle Correctional Center. (crt,Haik, K)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Reginald T Morris, Lafayette Parish Correctional Center, re: #7 Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely, returned marked: Return to Sender - Not Here, Unable to Forward. Action taken: On 6/14/19 clerk updated mailing address and re-mailed filing to plaintiff at LaSalle Correctional Center. (crt,Reeves, T)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Reginald T Morris. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to LaSalle Correctional Center, 15976 Hwy 165, Olla, LA 71465 and resent docs. 6 & 7 in 19-cv-528, 11 & 14 in 19-cv-230 and 9 & 10 in 19-cv-345. Clerk also forwarded a docket sheet in cases 1:18-cv-01322, 1:19-cv-00230, 6:18-cv-01323, 6:19-cv-00345, 6:19-cv-00528, 6:19-cv-00546 to plaintiff at updated address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable:, Reginald T Morris, Lafayette Parish Correctional Center, P O Box 2537, Lafayette LA 70502, re: #6 Report and Recommendations, returned marked: Return to Sender - No Longer Here. (crt,Williams, L)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for defendant Shetty to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Pro Se Response due by 6/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Service packet)(crt,Haik, K)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Reginald T Morris. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT plaintiff's claims against 15th Judicial District Court, Judge Marilyn Castle, Lafayette Parish Correctional Center and Sheriff' s Office of Lafayette Parish be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state a claim for which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/20/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Reginald T Morris, Lafayette Parish Correctional Center, re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, returned marked: return to sender, not here. (crt,Haik, K)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/29/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 24, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reginald T Morris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 15th Judicial District Court, Marilyn Castle, Sheriffs Office of Lafayette Parish, Lafayette Parish Correctional Center, Shetty filed by Reginald T Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Shetty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Lafayette Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Shetty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette Parish Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15th Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Marilyn Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald T Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?