Soileau v. Midsouth Bancorp Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bernadine D Soileau
Defendant: MidSouth Bancorp Inc, MidSouth National Bank N A and Midsouth Bank N A
Case Number: 6:2019cv00537
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/1/2019. (crt,Coreil, H)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Bernadine D Soileau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Bernadine Soileau)(aty,Perret, Henry)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Midsouth Bank N A. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Ryan, Craig)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Midsouth Bank N A . (aty,Ryan, Craig)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midsouth Bank N A identifying Corporate Parent MidSouth Bancorp Inc for Midsouth Bank N A. (aty,Ryan, Craig)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Midsouth Bank N A. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (aty,Ryan, Craig) Modified docket text on 5/2/2019 (Bunting, M).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/1/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to James Dalton Bayard, Craig A Ryan on behalf of MidSouth Bancorp Inc, MidSouth National Bank N A, Midsouth Bank N A. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/14/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against MidSouth Bancorp Inc, MidSouth National Bank N A, Midsouth Bank N A filed by Bernadine D Soileau. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against MidSouth Bancorp Inc, MidSouth National Bank N A, Midsouth Bank N A filed by Bernadine D Soileau. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #3 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC, St. Landry Parish, Case Number C-180577 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3934794) filed by Midsouth Bancorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Attorney Craig A Ryan added to party Midsouth Bancorp, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Ryan, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soileau v. Midsouth Bancorp Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine D Soileau
Represented By: Henry C Perret, Jr
Represented By: Paul Andrew Rabalais, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MidSouth Bancorp Inc
Represented By: Craig A Ryan
Represented By: James Dalton Bayard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MidSouth National Bank N A
Represented By: Craig A Ryan
Represented By: James Dalton Bayard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midsouth Bank N A
Represented By: Craig A Ryan
Represented By: James Dalton Bayard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?