Danos L L C et al v. Superior Energy Services L L C et al
Plaintiff: Danos L L C, The Gray Insurance Company and Gray Insurance Co
Defendant: Superior Energy Services Inc, Superior Energy Services L L C, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2019cv00601
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 43:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #1 Complaint. A refund of the initial payment of $400.00, 0536-3945124, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Gray & Co Inc for Gray Insurance Co by Gray Insurance Co. (aty,Kay, Ped) Modified on 5/10/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Ped C Kay, III on behalf of Gray Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/24/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Superior Energy Services Inc, Superior Energy Services L L C (crt,Crick, S)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Danos L L C. (aty,Kay, Ped)
May 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND FOR RECOVERY OF DEFENSE COSTS PURSUANT TO CONTRACT against Superior Energy Services L L C, Superior Energy Services Inc, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3945152) filed by Danos L L C, Gray Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Ped C Kay, III added to party Danos L L C(pty:pla), Gray Insurance Co(pty:pla))(aty,Kay, Ped) Modified on 5/9/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danos L L C et al v. Superior Energy Services L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danos L L C
Represented By: Ped C Kay, III
Represented By: Hal J Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Gray Insurance Company
Represented By: Ped C Kay, III
Represented By: Hal J Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gray Insurance Co
Represented By: Ped C Kay, III
Represented By: Hal J Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Energy Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?