E P C Healthcare L L C v. CircleLink Health L L C et al
Plaintiff: EPC Healthcare, LLC and E P C Healthcare L L C
Defendant: Jane Doe, Joseph Anstey, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd, CircleLink Healthcare, Gemini Insurance Co, Kimberly Ann Auger, Rony Schlapfer, Raphael Anstey, CircleLink Health Inc and CircleLink Health L L C
Case Number: 6:2019cv00625
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #19 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion day set for 8/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #17 MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Seal Attached Document . Action taken: Modified to indicate Electronically Filed in Error. Document corrected and resubmitted as #18 and #19 . (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer Case by Joseph Anstey, Raphael Anstey, CircleLink Health Inc, Rony Schlapfer. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Lessell, Melissa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal Attached Document by Joseph Anstey, Raphael Anstey, CircleLink Health Inc, Rony Schlapfer. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed exhibit, #2 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Lessell, Melissa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Transfer Case , MOTION to Seal Attached Document by Joseph Anstey, Raphael Anstey, CircleLink Health Inc, Rony Schlapfer. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Lessell, Melissa) Modified to indicate electronically filed in error on 7/10/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension. The new due date for Plaintiff's Motion for Remand is due 7/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/11/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Remand with consent by E P C Healthcare L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit Attorney Certificate)(aty,Palmintier, Joshua) Modified to correct event type and edit docket text on 6/10/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
June 10, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Joshua Michael Palmintier on behalf of E P C Healthcare L L C regarding #14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Motion for Remand with consent MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time with consent . Action taken: Modified to indicate Electronically Filed in Error. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Motion for Remand with consent , MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time with consent by E P C Healthcare L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Order for Motion for Leave, #2 Proposed pleading Motion for Extension of Time, #3 Proposed order Order for Extension of Time, #4 Proposed exhibit Attorney Certificate)(aty,Palmintier, Joshua) Modified to indicate document electronically filed in error on 6/10/2019. (ThomasSld, T).
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Joseph Anstey, Raphael Anstey, CircleLink Health Inc, Rony Schlapfer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record as of May 28, 2019)(aty,Lessell, Melissa) Modified to edit filers on 6/3/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc for Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event and add to corporate parent. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 5/23/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Gemini Insurance Co answer due 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/21/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gemini Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent W R Berkley Corp for Gemini Insurance Co, Other Affiliate William R Berkley. (aty,Kleeman, Douglas) Modified to edit docket text on 5/21/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Douglas Kleeman on behalf of Gemini Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/3/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Daniel B Centner on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/3/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Gemini Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Local District Court Rule 7.9 Certificate)(aty,Kleeman, Douglas)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/17/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd answer due 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/17/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS with consent sought but not yet obtained by Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 CERTIFICATE OF EFFORTS)(aty,Centner, Daniel) Modified to correct event type on 5/16/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 15, 2019 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Gemini Insurance Co, Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 to Document #1 , Notice of removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 15, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 15th JDC, Parish of Lafayette. Raphael Anstey answer due 5/22/2019; Kimberly Ann Auger answer due 5/22/2019; CircleLink Health Inc answer due 5/22/2019; Gemini Insurance Co answer due 5/22/2019; Rony Schlapfer answer due 5/22/2019; Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd answer due 5/22/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) Modified on 5/16/2019 to correct service information. Defendant Joseph Anstey has not been served. (Mitchell, P)
May 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Mitchell, P)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CircleLink Healthcare. (aty,Lessell, Melissa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC, Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2019-0025 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3949300) filed by Raphael Anstey, CircleLink Healthcare, Joseph Anstey, Rony Schlapfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Petition), #2 Exhibit B (State Court citations and pleadings), #3 Exhibit C (Consent and Joinder to Removal from Properly Joined Defendants), #4 Civil cover sheet, #5 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Attorney Melissa M Lessell added to party Joseph Anstey(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa M Lessell added to party Raphael Anstey(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa M Lessell added to party CircleLink Healthcare(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa M Lessell added to party Rony Schlapfer(pty:dft))(aty,Lessell, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E P C Healthcare L L C v. CircleLink Health L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Anstey
Represented By: Melissa M Lessell
Represented By: Karen P Holland
Represented By: Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Co Ltd
Represented By: Seth A Schmeeckle
Represented By: Daniel B Centner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CircleLink Healthcare
Represented By: Melissa M Lessell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Co
Represented By: Douglas Kleeman
Represented By: Jay R Sever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Ann Auger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rony Schlapfer
Represented By: Melissa M Lessell
Represented By: Karen P Holland
Represented By: Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael Anstey
Represented By: Melissa M Lessell
Represented By: Karen P Holland
Represented By: Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CircleLink Health Inc
Represented By: Melissa M Lessell
Represented By: Karen P Holland
Represented By: Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CircleLink Health L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPC Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E P C Healthcare L L C
Represented By: Joshua Michael Palmintier
Represented By: Monica Gant Moton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?