Olson v. Schnauder et al
Plaintiff: Laureen Olson
Defendant: Marcus C Naquin, Jennifer Decuir, Robert E Ruel, III, Kent C Guidry, Gregory L Waddell, Kenneth Schnauder, Patrick C Breaux, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Luis M Alvarado, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Corey J Hebert and Christopher M Foret
Case Number: 6:2019cv00645
Filed: May 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael J Juneau
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/2/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with consent from all defendants by Laureen Olson. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order for extension of time to respond)(aty,Jordan, J)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #11 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion day set for 8/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 (ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion day set for 8/15/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to indicate electronically filed in error on 6/21/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Petition from docket 2011-0898K, #3 Medical Malpractice Complaint, #4 PCF Certification of Enrollment, #5 Petition from docket 2013-1850C, #6 Petition for Approval of Settlement, #7 Petition from docket 652,921 sec. 24, #8 Amended Petition 652,921 sec. 24, #9 Motion to Dismiss with Reservation of Rights, #10 Judgment of Dismissal 1/22/18, #11 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice, #12 Judgement of Dismissal 1/17/19, #13 Release and Settlement Agreement)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/19/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel David A Woolridge, Jr,Dennis J Phayer for Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, for Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/18/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for David A. Woolridge, Jr., Dennis J. Phayer to Enroll as Counsel by Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Laborde, Stephanie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING MOTION: #5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #6 PROPOSED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted, and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join Parties is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 6/14/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
June 13, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motions referred to Judge Michael J Juneau. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted, and Failure to Join by Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Petition from docket 2011-0898K, #3 Exhibit Medical Malpractice Complain, #4 Exhibit PCF Certification of Enrollment, #5 Exhibit Petition from docket 2013-1850C, #6 Exhibit Petition for Approval of Settlement, #7 Exhibit Petition from docket 652,921 sec. 24, #8 Exhibit Amended Petition 652,921 sec. 24, #9 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss with Reservation of Rights, #10 Exhibit Judgment of Dismissal 1/22/18, #11 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice, #12 Exhibit Judgement of Dismissal 1/17/19, #13 Exhibit Release and Settlement Agreement)(aty,Chapman, John) Modified to remove duplicate docket text and to indicate document is proposed (see #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on 6/14/2019 (ThomasSld, T). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim on 6/14/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed pleading)(aty,Chapman, John) Modified docket text on 6/13/2019 (Bunting, M).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency to John Jacob Chapman on behalf of Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Reason: A motion for leave to file must be accompanied by the proposed pleading. The court will not act on such a motion without reviewing the document sought to be filed. Please refer to LR 7.6 for more information. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 8, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief , #2 Proposed order )(Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Luis M Alvarado(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Patrick C Breaux(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Jennifer Decuir(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Christopher M Foret(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Kent C Guidry(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Corey J Hebert(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Kurt Loup(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Marcus C Naquin(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Robert E Ruel, III(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Kenneth Schnauder(pty:dft), Attorney John Jacob Chapman added to party Gregory L Waddell(pty:dft))(aty,Chapman, John) Modified to reflect deficient status and to remove duplicate docket text on 6/10/2019 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to indicate document corrected and resubmitted in its entirety on 6/14/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Christopher M Foret, Kent C Guidry, Corey J Hebert, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, Kurt Loup, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Kenneth Schnauder, Gregory L Waddell. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher M Foret, Kent Guidry, Luis M Alvarado, Patrick C Breaux, Jennifer Decuir, Corey J Hebert, Marcus C Naquin, Robert E Ruel, III, Gregory L Waddell, Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund and Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3952404) filed by Laureen Olson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney J Lomax Jordan, Jr added to party Laureen Olson(pty:pla))(aty,Jordan, J) Modified to indicate filing fee paid and receipt number on 5/20/2019 (ThomasSld, T). Modified to edit docket text on 5/21/2019 (ThomasSld, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Schnauder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus C Naquin
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Decuir
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Ruel, III
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent C Guidry
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L Waddell
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Schnauder
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick C Breaux
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oversight Board of Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Loup
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis M Alvarado
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Patients Compensation Fund
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey J Hebert
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M Foret
Represented By: Dennis J Phayer
Represented By: David A Woolridge, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Chapman
Represented By: John Jacob Chapman
Represented By: Stephanie B Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laureen Olson
Represented By: J Lomax Jordan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?