Franklin v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Plaintiff: Gerald Franklin
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Case Number: 6:2019cv00663
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Howmedica Osteonics Corp . (Attachments: #1 Certified State Court Record)(aty,Moore, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, pending receipt of records confirming the identity of the particular medical device at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/21/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Answer with consent by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moore, Douglas) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 6/20/2019 (Bunting, M).
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howmedica Osteonics Corp identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corp, Other Affiliate Howmedica Osteonics Corp for Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (aty,Moore, Douglas)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/29/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re State Court Service Returned Executed with consent sought but not yet obtained by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Moore, Douglas)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/28/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removalsent to Douglas John Moore, Shannon Marie Jaeckel on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Howmedica Osteonics Corp answer due 5/30/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Mary Parish, Case Number 133640 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3956802) filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Douglas John Moore added to party Howmedica Osteonics Corp(pty:selreq))(aty,Moore, Douglas) Modified on 5/24/2019 to correct title. (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Franklin
Represented By: Edward J Cloos, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?