Doucet et al v. Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc
Plaintiff: Keith W Doucet and Kenosha D Ardoin
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00789
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, not later than August 23, 2019, the removing defendant shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts that support a finding that the amount in controversy for either Mr. Doucet or Ms. Ardoin exceeds the jurisdictional minimum. These facts should be supported with summary-judgment-type evidence. The plaintiffs will be allowed seven days to respond to the defendant's submission. Compliance Deadline set for 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/5/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/22/2019. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/26/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 9/19/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 2/20/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 1/21/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 2/20/2020. Discovery deadline 3/23/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2020. Daubert Motions due by 4/20/2020. Motions in Limine due by 7/20/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 7/20/2020. Pretrial Order due by 8/4/2020. Bench Books due by 8/4/2020. Trial Depositions due by 8/4/2020. Real Time glossary due by 8/11/2020. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 8/11/2020.. Signed by Paula S. Jordan on 8/1/2019. (crt,Jordan, P)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Williams, Lance)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc.(aty,Williams, Lance) Modified on 7/1/2019 to edit text (Putch, A).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/24/2019. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 20, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 20, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc answer due 6/27/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corp for Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc. (aty,Williams, Lance) Modified on 6/21/2019 to add corporate parent (Putch, A).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 27th JDC St. Landry, Case Number 19-2028 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3978971) filed by Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit "B" - Notice to State Court and Adverse Party, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Lance B Williams added to party Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doucet et al v. Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc
Represented By: Lance B Williams
Represented By: Mary Wilderotter Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith W Doucet
Represented By: Guy O Mitchell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenosha D Ardoin
Represented By: Guy O Mitchell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?